Imagine if you had a math genie with you, then you could solve your math problems in a jiffy. But alas, there is no math genie, and you must solve your math problems yourself. However, learning nice math tricks has never hurt a soul, right! So, here are 9 tricks to solve your math problems quickly in your head. After you learn these tricks, you might as well become a **champion math solver**. So, now, without any further ado, read about these tips and solve math problems in your head.

**Add large numbers in moments** of math

Many ways to add larger numbers in your head. Let’s see the simplest example:

345+ 168

There is an easier way to add them. You can try to round the numbers:

So, 345 becomes 350, and 168 becomes 170.

Your result will be 350+170= 520. To round them up, you must find out how much you added to the original sums.

350-345= 5 and 170-168= 2

To find the original equation, you must add 5+2= 7 and subtract 7 from 520.

520-7= 513.

So, the answer will be 345+168= 513.

**Subtract from 1000 like a pro**

The basic rule for subtracting large numbers from 1,000 is subtracting every number except the last number from 9. Furthermore, you have to subtract the final number from 10. Let us understand with an example.

**1,000 – 446 = **

- Step 1: Subtract 4 from 9 = 5
- Step 2: Subtract 4 from 9 = 5
- Step 3: Subtract 6 from 10 = 4

Your answer will be 554.

**Multiplying 5 with any number quickly**

Multiplying any number by 5 has a quick way. Follow this example to learn and implement it the next time you have to multiply something.

Let’s take the equation 5 X 7

Subtract one from the 7, and it becomes 6.

Now, half the number 6 and it becomes 3.

Now, add 5 after 3, and it becomes 35.

Therefore, you have the answer, which is 35.

You can also solve this problem on an **online math solver** tool to know the validity of the result.

**Learn new division tricks **

learn whether any number is divisible by any number in certain ways. Here is a detailed example:

You can divide the number by 10 if that ends with 0.

- With 9, if the digits when added together, can be evenly divisible by 9
- With 8 if the last three numbers are divisible by 8 or if they are 000.
- With 6, if the digits are divisible by 3 when added together.
- With 5, if it ends with 5 or 0.
- With 4, if the last digits end with 00 or are evenly divisible by 4
- With 3, if the result of the added digits is divisible by 3
- With 2 if it ends with 0,2,4,6 and 8.

**Know how to multiply by 9**

Here is one of the easiest methods of multiplying any number by 9. For example, 9 x 4

- Step 1: Subtract 1 from 4 = 3

3 is the first answer to the problem, 9 x 4.

- Step 2: Now you have to Subtract 3 from 9; 9-3 = 6

Finally, 6 is the second digit of the answer to the multiplication problem, 9 x 4.

So, the total is 36.

You can also get the answer to such questions **written** through a ** math problem solver** to get a quicker result.

**10 and 11 times tricks**

Multiplying any number with 10 is easiest. Just add zero to the end of the number multiplied by 10.

For example,

75 x 10 = 750.

You can also multiply any two digits number by 11.

For example:

11 x 32.

You have to add a space between the two digits like this:

3_2

Finally, add those two numbers together and put the result in the centre:

3_ (3+2) _2

The answer is: 3_5_2

Therefore, the final answer is: 11 x 32= 352

You can also use a multiplication **problem solver** and **math tool** for faster results.

**The percentage game**

Finding a percentage of a number can be a little difficult, but there are ways to find a correct solution. For example, to find 5% of 115, you have to follow these steps:

- Step 1: If you move the decimal over one place, 115 becomes 11.5.
- Step 2: Now divide 11.5 by, and you will get 5.75, which is your answer.

You can use a calculator to get your answer instantly for faster results.

**Squaring two-digit numbers like a pro**

You can square any number that ends with 5 quickly and like a pro. For example, let’s take 35.

First, multiply 3 with itself and add it up with 1.

Then, put a 25 in the end.

So, 35 squared is [3 x (3 + 1)] & 25

[3 x (3+1)] = 12

12 & 25= 1225

Therefore, 25 squared = 1225

You can check the answer’s validity on online math tools.

**Ace tough multiplication**

When you have to multiply large numbers, you can multiply them quickly if the numbers are even. You can divide the first half of the number and then double the second number. For example:

40 x 80

- Step 1: Divide 40 by 2, and you will get 20. And if you double 80, you will get 160.
- Step 2: Now multiply the two results together:

20 x 160= 3,200

Therefore, the answer is 3,200.

*Parting words*

*Parting words*

These tricks are simple and effective. You can also take __homework writers__ Furthermore, practising these sums can help you to enhance your math skills faster. So, practice more sums and stun your teachers with newfound skills today. Best of luck!